This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 13:41:15 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA VS LOPEZ, LOUIE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 RODRIGUEZ, VANESSA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LOPEZ, LOUIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMERIAN, MICHAEL R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1666

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMERIAN, MICHAEL R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ VANESSA

Respondent

LOPEZ LOUIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEE MINYONG KIM

 

Court Documents

Response - Domestic Violence

12/30/2020: Response - Domestic Violence

Substitution of Attorney

12/18/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Service

Substitution of Attorney - New Representative, MINYONG lEE

12/15/2020: Substitution of Attorney - New Representative, MINYONG lEE

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/15/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

12/15/2020: Minute Order

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

11/25/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

11/25/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

11/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Hearing01/12/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department L at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department L, Amerian, Michael R, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (New Representative, MINYONG lEE ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less