This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 08:12:31 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, MARTIN MOISES GIL VS LESNIEWICZ, JAMES WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 RODRIGUEZ, MARTIN MOISES GIL filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against LESNIEWICZ, JAMES WILLIAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0933

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ MARTIN MOISES GIL

Respondent

LESNIEWICZ JAMES WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

10/6/2020: Proof of Service

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

9/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Petition - Civil Harassment

9/25/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

9/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • Hearing10/29/2020 at 1:30 PM in Department 6 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less