This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 17:35:32 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, JAIME VS SANCHEZ, MARIA ALCANTA

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 RODRIGUEZ, JAIME filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANCHEZ, MARIA ALCANTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ JAIME

Respondent

SANCHEZ MARIA ALCANTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSIAK RICHARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/6/2023: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

1/6/2023: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/6/2023: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Notice - Case Assignment

1/6/2023: Notice - Case Assignment

Summons - Summons

1/6/2023: Summons - Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/2/2023: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

2/2/2023: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail

2/2/2023: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

2/2/2023: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Income and Expense

2/2/2023: Declaration - Income and Expense

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

2/3/2023: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (Proposed Fee Waiver - FW003 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less