Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 18:54:46 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, ADELBERT R. VS DAVIS, BREANNA

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 RODRIGUEZ, ADELBERT R filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against DAVIS, BREANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VEASEY, GLENDA and BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0322

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VEASEY, GLENDA

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ ADELBERT R.

Respondent

DAVIS BREANNA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/16/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/25/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 09/16/20 Dept H 8:30am

8/25/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 09/16/20 Dept H 8:30am

Minute Order

7/31/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hearing date 8-25-20 8:30 am Dept. H

7/31/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hearing date 8-25-20 8:30 am Dept. H

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 07/31/20 Dept H 8:30am

6/5/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 07/31/20 Dept H 8:30am

Minute Order

6/5/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Civil Harassment

5/20/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

5/20/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

5/20/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

5/20/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department H, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 09/16/20 Dept H 8:30am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department H, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hearing date 8-25-20 8:30 am Dept. H ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department H, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 07/31/20 Dept H 8:30am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less