This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 02:16:27 (UTC).

RODRIGO DIAZ RAMOS VS CHYNNA SASHA GRISSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by RODRIGO DIAZ RAMOS against CHYNNA SASHA GRISSON in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1777

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

RAMOS RODRIGO DIAZ

Respondents and Defendants

LABREW TOYANN TROIES

LABREW MARK HARRY

DOES 1 TO 100

GRISSON CHYNNA SASHA

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/15/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/15/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/27/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Motion to Continue Trial Date

4/9/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Notice of Ruling

5/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

5/6/2019: Minute Order

Order

5/6/2019: Order

CoverSheet

1/26/2018: CoverSheet

CoverSheet

1/26/2018: CoverSheet

Summons

1/26/2018: Summons

Complaint

1/26/2018: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Order (Granting Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rodrigo Diaz Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rodrigo Diaz Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rodrigo Diaz Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Notice of Ruling (ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by Chynna Sasha Grisson (Defendant); Toyann Troies Labrew (Defendant); Mark Harry Labrew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Chynna Sasha Grisson (Defendant); Toyann Troies Labrew (Defendant); Mark Harry Labrew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Chynna Sasha Grisson (Defendant); Toyann Troies Labrew (Defendant); Mark Harry Labrew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Chynna Sasha Grisson (Defendant); Toyann Troies Labrew (Defendant); Mark Harry Labrew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Answer (to unverified complaint of Rodrigo Diaz Ramos); Filed by Chynna Sasha Grisson (Defendant); Toyann Troies Labrew (Defendant); Mark Harry Labrew (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Rodrigo Diaz Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691777    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

RODRIGO DIAZ RAMOS,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CHYNNA SASHA GRISSON, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC691777

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 4, 2020

Plaintiff filed this action on 1/26/18.  To date, there is no proof of service of the summons and complaint on file; it is therefore not clear when Plaintiff served Defendant.  Defendant appeared on 2/15/19, most likely due to only recently being served. 

On 5/06/19, the Court granted Defendant’s motion to continue the trial from 7/26/19 to 3/30/20.  The Court noted:

The Court typically sets trial dates eighteen months from the filing of the complaint.  Plaintiffs are expected to serve defendants within one month after they file complaints, and defendants are expected to file their responsive pleadings within one month thereafter; thus, trial is typically held sixteen months after a defendant appeared in the action.  In this case, Defendant seeks to continue the trial date to 3/30/20, which is just over thirteen months after she appeared in the action.  The Court finds her recent appearance in the case constitutes good cause for the requested continuance, and grants the motion. 

At this time, Defendant again moves to continue the trial.  She provides evidence that there have been ongoing efforts to depose Plaintiff and conduct her IME, but those dates are now scheduled in January of 2020.  Defendant notes that she cannot meaningfully prepare for trial, including expert analysis, unless the trial date is continued.  Defense Counsel declares the next mutually agreeable date for trial is 8/03/20; notably, Plaintiff agrees to the requested continuance and there is no opposition to the motion.

The Court finds good cause to grant the motion.  The Court is concerned, however, about the duration of the continuance: five months.  The Court is inclined to grant the relief, but asks the parties to treat the 8/03/20 trial date as “firm” in light of the prior extended (eight-month) continuance.   

The 3/20/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 8/04/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse.  The 3/16/20 FSC is advanced to today’s date and continued to 7/21/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 31.  All discovery cut-off dates are extended to reflect the new trial date. 

Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.