Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:11:29 (UTC).

RODOLPHO LIZAOLA VS DANNY GARCIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 RODOLPHO LIZAOLA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANNY GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0036

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIZAOLA RODOLPHO

Defendants

PRECISION GUNITE CORPORATION A CORPORATION

GARCIA DANNY

D.S.G. LEASING CORP. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBERATORE ANTHONY ALBERT ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HAZARD DEAN WARREN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/12/2019: Answer

Unknown

1/15/2019: Unknown

Summons

1/15/2019: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/17/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by PRECISION GUNITE CORPORATION, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Answer; Filed by DANNY GARCIA (Defendant); PRECISION GUNITE CORPORATION, a corporation (Defendant); D.S.G. LEASING CORP., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RODOLPHO LIZAOLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Precision Gunite Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIBERATORE ANTHONY ALBERT