This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2020 at 03:20:33 (UTC).

RODNEY ROUZAN VS LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 RODNEY ROUZAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9753

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

ROUZAN RODNEY

THE WESTMORELAND LAW FIRM

Defendants and Respondents

GANNON PATRICK AN INDIVIDUAL AND

LOS ANGELES AIRPORT POLICE

MAGGARD DAVID JR. AN INDIVIDUAL AND

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

HYAM MICHAEL AN INDIVIDUAL AND OFFICIAL

LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS

DOES 1-100

ADAMS DOE 2 PAULA

CHAVEZ DOE 5 IMER

MAGGARD DOE 4 DAVID

MENGITSU DOE 1 SAMSON

MOR DOE 3 PATRICIA

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

THE WESTMORELAND LAW FIRM

PITVOREC HEATHER

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WESTMORELAND DOMINIQUE ESQ.

WESTMORELAND DOMINIQUE NIKKO ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RUIZ RODOLFO F. ESQ.

RUIZ RODOLFO FLORENTINO ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

1/6/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

10/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRACE MIGUEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRACE MIGUEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BERTHA ARROYOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BERTHA ARROYOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Brief - BRIEF RE IDC

9/18/2019: Brief - BRIEF RE IDC

Notice - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

9/10/2019: Notice - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ)

7/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CONTINUED DEPOSITION

6/11/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CONTINUED DEPOSITION

Declaration - Declaration of Shakira L. Ferguson in Support of Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Compel Plaintiff Rodney Rouzan to Appear for an Independent Medical Examination

3/1/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Shakira L. Ferguson in Support of Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Compel Plaintiff Rodney Rouzan to Appear for an Independent Medical Examination

Reply - Reply in Support of Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Compel Plaintiff Rodney Rouzan to Appear for an Independent Medical Examination with James R. High, M.D.

3/1/2019: Reply - Reply in Support of Defendant City of Los Angeles' Motion to Compel Plaintiff Rodney Rouzan to Appear for an Independent Medical Examination with James R. High, M.D.

Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF SANDRA FALCHETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WORLD AIRPORT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/7/2019: Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF SANDRA FALCHETTI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WORLD AIRPORT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Separate Statement

5/24/2019: Separate Statement

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONFIRMING PROPER E-SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATE BY SHORTENING TIM

5/29/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONFIRMING PROPER E-SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING DATE BY SHORTENING TIM

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

6/4/2019: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/24/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (B303637, NOA 1/6/20;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by Rodney Rouzan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Rodney Rouzan (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:1/6/20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Rodney Rouzan (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Continued Deposition) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Los Angeles World Airports Erroneously Sued As City Of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rodney Rouzan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. RETALIATION IN VIOLATION COY. CODE 12940(H) & (I); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699753    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 31

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE IS GRANTED.

Relevant Background 

On March 27, 2018, Plaintiff Rodney Rouzan filed the instant action against Defendants City of Los Angeles (sued and served as Los Angeles World Airports and Los Angeles Airport Police); David Maggard; Patrick Gannon; Michael Hyam; and Does 1 through 100. On July 24, 2018, Plaintiff filed the Second Amended Complaint (“SAC”). The SAC asserts causes of action for: 

  1. Retaliation in Violation of Gov. Code § 12940(h) & (i);

  2. Retaliation in Violation of Public Policy;

  3. Violation of Cal. Labor Code § 98.6;

  4. Violation of Cal. Labor Code § 1102.5(b) & (c);

  5. Discrimination on the Basis of National Origin; and

  6. Violation of Cal. Labor Code § 232.5(c). 

On July 30, 2018, Plaintiff dismissed without prejudice Defendants David Maggard, Jr.; Patrick Gannon; and Michael Hyam, leaving Defendant City of Los Angeles as the only remaining defendant. On January 17, 2019, the Court dismissed Does 1 through 100 without prejudice. On July 8, 2019, Plaintiff filed an Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name), naming Paula Adams as Doe 2. 

The Court notes that the Minute Order dated January 17, 2019 states: “The Court orders Does 1-100 in Complaint filed by RODNEY ROUZAN on 03/27/2018 dismissed without prejudice.” The operative complaint on January 17, 2019 was the Second Amended Complaint (SAC). As it was the Court’s intent to strike the Doe Defendants as to the operative complaint, the Court now orders that all Doe Defendants named in the SAC are dismissed nunc pro tunc as of January 17, 2019. 

Legal Standard 

Code of Civil Procedure section 418.10 provides in relevant part: 

(a) A defendant, on or before the last day of his or her time to plead or within any further time that the court may for good cause allow, may serve and file a notice of motion for one or more of the following purposes:

(1) To quash service of summons on the ground of lack of jurisdiction of the court over him or her. 

When a defendant moves to quash service of the summons and complaint, the plaintiff has “the burden of proving the facts that did give the court jurisdiction, that is the facts requisite to an effective service.” (Coulston v. Cooper (1966) 245 Cal.App.2d 866, 868.) 

Further, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 436, “the court may, upon a motion made pursuant to Section 435, or at any time in its discretion, and upon terms it deems proper: (a) Strike out any irrelevant, false, or improper matter inserted in any pleading. (b) Strike out all or any part of any pleading not drawn or filed in conformity with the laws of this state, a court rule, or an order of the court.” The grounds for a motion to strike must “appear on the face of the challenged pleading or from any matter of which the court is required to take judicial notice.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 437.) 

Discussion

“The law is settled that a person who is not named either by his true or a fictitious name or as an unknown defendant is not a proper party to an action, and service of summons upon such person upon proper motion should be quashed.” (Kline v. Beauchamp (1938) 29 Cal.App.2d 340, 342.)

Specially Appearing Defendant Paula Adams (hereinafter “Defendant” or “Adams”) moves for an order quashing service of summons and complaint on her. Defendant argues that on January 17, 2019, approximately 6 months prior to Plaintiff’s attempt to name Adams as a Doe defendant, the Court dismissed Does 1 through 100. Defendant asserts that Plaintiff’s attempt to name Adams as Doe 2 is improper and invalid as the Does are no longer named in the operative pleading. Defendant contends that the purported service on Adams is therefore equally invalid. Defendant argues that because Adams is not a proper defendant in this matter, the Court lacks jurisdiction over her and should issue an order quashing service of the summons on Defendant.

The Court finds that as a result of its dismissing the Doe Defendants on January 17, 2019, any attempt to amend the operative complaint to name a person as a Doe Defendant is not proper, as the Doe Defendants are no longer parties to this case. Thus, Plaintiff’s naming of Adams as Doe 2 was improper and the purported service on Adams is also improper and must be quashed.

Based on the foregoing, Specially Appearing Defendant’s unopposed motion to quash service of summons and complaint is GRANTED.

On the Court’s own motion, the Amendments to Complaint filed on July 8, 2019, designating Doe 1 as Samson Mengitsu, Doe 2 as Paula Adams, Doe 3 as Patricia Mor, Doe 4 as David Maggard, and Doe 5 as Imer Chavez are stricken.

Moving party to give notice.