This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 02:09:02 (UTC).

RODNEY FLAGG VS ARTHUR GORDON ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by RODNEY FLAGG against ARTHUR GORDON in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1482

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

FLAGG RODNEY

Respondents and Defendants

MUNOZ RAM

GORDON ARTHUR

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

3/5/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

3/7/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Notice

4/4/2019: Notice

Order

4/17/2019: Order

Minute Order

4/17/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

4/18/2019: Notice of Ruling

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/10/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/15/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Exhibit List

5/15/2019: Exhibit List

Separate Statement

5/15/2019: Separate Statement

Notice

5/23/2019: Notice

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

5/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Notice

5/31/2019: Notice

Notice

6/24/2019: Notice

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

1/26/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/26/2018: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance of Trial to 12.4.19); Filed by Rodney Flagg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Rodney Flagg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Death of Defendant Arthur Gordon and Request for OSC re Status of Claims); Filed by Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Arthur); Filed by Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Arthur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rodney Flagg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rodney Flagg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DEFENDANT ARTHUR GORDON'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Rodney Flagg (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691482    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

RODNEY FLAGG,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ARTHUR GORDON, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC691482

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT ARTHUR GORDON’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 25, 2020

Defendant Arthur Gordon’s motion for summary judgment is CONTINUED. Furthermore, the Court sets an OSC regarding the status of Defendant Arthur Gordon (“Defendant”), who has passed. The Court will make an inquiry at this hearing to determine a suitable OSC date for the parties. The hearing on this motion for summary judgment will be continued to the date of the OSC.

On May 23, 2019, Defendant’s counsel filed a notice with the Court that Defendant Arthur Gordon died on May 15, 2019. On October 10, 2019, the Court granted Defendant’s ex parte application for an order to continue the trial date to May 18, 2020, in order for the parties to open an estate for Defendant, afford private mediation, and complete discovery if private medication is unsuccessful. Since then, Plaintiff Rodney Flagg has not yet sought leave to amend his complaint to add Defendant’s estate as a defendant or otherwise acted in this matter. It is necessary for the parties to resolve the issue of Defendant’s status before trial.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.