This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 15:26:05 (UTC).

RODGER AND JONNIE CAMPING FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 RODGER AND JONNIE CAMPING FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2783

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CAMPING JEREMIAH

CAMPING NATHAN

Not Classified By Court

RODGER AND JONNIE CAMPING FAMILY TRUST

Interested Party

KEYSTONE LAW GROUP P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PHILLIPS GEORGE RICHARD JR

Interested Party Attorneys

TAYLOR JOSHUA DOUGLAS

TAYLOR JOSHUA D.

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition to Determine the Existence and Validity of Trust

3/24/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition to Determine the Existence and Validity of Trust

Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code)

3/24/2021: Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code)

Notice - Hearing

3/30/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

3/30/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing - E/V

3/30/2021: Notice - Hearing - E/V

Notice - Hearing

3/30/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Lien - Notice of Attorney Lien

4/12/2021: Notice - Lien - Notice of Attorney Lien

Request - Special Notice

4/12/2021: Request - Special Notice

Supplement - Supplement No. 1 to Petition to Determine Validity of Trust

8/16/2021: Supplement - Supplement No. 1 to Petition to Determine Validity of Trust

Supplement - Supplement No. 1 to Heggstad Petition

8/16/2021: Supplement - Supplement No. 1 to Heggstad Petition

Supplement - Supplement No. 2 to Petition to Determine the Existence and Validity of Trust

8/17/2021: Supplement - Supplement No. 2 to Petition to Determine the Existence and Validity of Trust

Minute Order

8/18/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/18/2021: Minute Order

Notice - OF ENTRY OF ORDER

9/23/2021: Notice - OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Notice - OF ENTRY OF ORDER

9/23/2021: Notice - OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Order

9/21/2021: Order

Order

9/21/2021: Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Probate Code 850 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (The Petition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code) filed on 3/24/2021 by Petitioner(s) Jeremiah Camping, Nathan Camping )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Lien (Notice of Attorney Lien ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (E/V ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition to Determine the Existence and Validity of Trust ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPetition - Determine Ownership (850 Probate Code); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEYSTONE LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR JOSHUA D.