Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2020 at 22:51:30 (UTC).

RODERICK COHN VS A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 RODERICK COHN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against A A READY MIXED CONCRETE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0704

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COHN RODERICH

Respondents and Defendants

A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE INC.

CEMAK TRUCKING INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

ASSOCIATES READY MIXED CONCRETE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAVIS HEATHER

NAYEBDADASH BOBAK ROBERT

MINNE SARA EMI

Defendant Attorney

BERRY STEPHEN L.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/15/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/16/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION)

Amended Complaint

10/18/2019: Amended Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/20/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS AND PAGA SETTLEMENT

1/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS AND PAGA SETTLEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER) OF 02/20/2020

2/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER) OF 02/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER)

2/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HEATHER DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

5/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HEATHER DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

5/15/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/18/2020

5/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/18/2020

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/1/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...)

7/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VOLUNTARY STAY OF DISCVOERY BASED ON AGREEMENT TO MEDIATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

3/13/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VOLUNTARY STAY OF DISCVOERY BASED ON AGREEMENT TO MEDIATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Case Management Statement

12/18/2018: Case Management Statement

Answer -

10/11/2018: Answer -

SUMMONS -

9/10/2018: SUMMONS -

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • Hearing05/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Roderich Cohn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Roderich Cohn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Order (Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Granting Final Approval of Class ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder (Final Order And Judgment); Filed by Roderich Cohn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff?s Motion for Final Approval of Class Action and PAGA Settlement); Filed by A & A Ready Mixed Concrete, Inc. (Defendant); Cemak Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Hearing on Motion for Order (Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 11:08 AM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by A & A Ready Mixed Concrete, Inc. (Defendant); Associated Ready Mixed Concrete, Inc. (Defendant); Cemak Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by A & A Ready Mixed Concrete, Inc. (Defendant); Associated Ready Mixed Concrete, Inc. (Defendant); Cemak Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roderich Cohn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEMAK TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where A & A READY MIXED CONCRETE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATED READY MIXED CONCRETE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS HEATHER