This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 06:21:27 (UTC).

ROD KOSSACK, ET AL. VS DP PROPERTY ENTERPRISES LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 ROD KOSSACK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DP PROPERTY ENTERPRISES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0271

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOSSACK ROD

ROD KOSSACK AS TRUSTEE OF ROD S. KOSSACK SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST

Defendants

CUARENTA JESUS EDGAR

FORTY GENERAL BUILDING INC

DP PROPERTY ENTERPRISES LLC

CUARENTA-JIMENEZ JOSE

PATEL MAYAN

LUIS FARIAS JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG RANDY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/01/2021

9/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 3:51 PM in Department F; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 09/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rod Kossack (Plaintiff); ROD KOSSACK, AS TRUSTEE OF ROD S. KOSSACK SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rod Kossack (Plaintiff); ROD KOSSACK, AS TRUSTEE OF ROD S. KOSSACK SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rod Kossack (Plaintiff); ROD KOSSACK, AS TRUSTEE OF ROD S. KOSSACK SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY