This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 03:42:15 (UTC).

ROCK THE WORLD, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL. VS ROC-A-FELLA RECORDS, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION , ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 ROCK THE WORLD, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROC-A-FELLA RECORDS, LLC, A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2733

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEST KANYE

ROCK THE WORLD LLC

MASCOTTE HOLDINGS INC.

GETTING OUT OUR DREAMS II LLC

GETTING OUT OUR DREAMS INC.

Defendants

DEF JAM RECORDINGS

ISLAND DEF JAM MUSIC GROUP

ROC-A-FELLA RECORDS LLC

BRAVADO INTERNATIONAL GROUP MERCHANDISING SERVICES INC.

UMG RECORDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHWARTZ ROBERT M.

QUINN JOHN B

RHOW EKWAN E

RHOW EKWAN E.

KANG GRACE W.

Defendant Attorney

SINGER DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/25/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Related Case

2/25/2019: Notice of Related Case

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

2/21/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/8/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Substitution of Attorney

9/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/18/2019

9/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 09/18/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

9/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Appearance

9/9/2019: Notice of Appearance

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/13/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearing03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference); Filed by Rock The World, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docketat 4:13 PM in Department 78; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference); Filed by Rock The World, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 78; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Rock The World, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Rock The World, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by Rock The World, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Rock The World, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint First; Filed by Rock The World, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rock The World, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rock The World, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rock The World, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams II, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation (Plaintiff); Getting Out Our Dreams, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roc-A-Fella Records LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINGER, DAVID R