This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2022 at 10:34:24 (UTC).

ROCIO MACIAS HERNANDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS PHONG TRUONG, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 ROCIO MACIAS HERNANDEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PHONG TRUONG, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0321

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ AN INDIVIDUAL ROCIO MACIAS

Defendants

RDJC LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SIERRA AUTOCARS INC. A CORPORATION D.B.A. SIERRA SUBARU OF MONROVIA DBA SIERRA SUBARU OF MONROVIA

SIERRA AUTOMOTIVE ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION

SIERRA MONROVIA SUB LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SIERRA PURSUITS INC. A CORPORATION

SIERRA SUBARU OF MONROVIA

SIERRA VEHICLES INC. A CORPORATION

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC. A CORPORATION

TRUONG AN INDIVIDUAL PHONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHAHREMAN KYANOUSH CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/31/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/1/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 08/02/2022

8/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 08/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions up to 250.00 against Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel for failure to appear in court on 8/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 08/02/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROCIO MACIAS HERNANDEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROCIO MACIAS HERNANDEZ, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIERRA VEHICLES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RDJC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ruth is a litigant

Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant