This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 01:15:49 (UTC).

ROCCO J DIFRANCESCO VS FCA US LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by ROCCO J DIFRANCESCO against FCA US LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1282

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DIFRANCESCO ROCCO J.

Defendants and Respondents

COURTESY CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM OF

FCA US LLC

COURTESY AUTO OF ORANGE COUNTY INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

2/5/2019: Association of Attorney

Motion in Limine

3/19/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

3/19/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

3/20/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

3/20/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

3/25/2019: Motion in Limine

Opposition

3/29/2019: Opposition

Opposition

3/29/2019: Opposition

Opposition

3/29/2019: Opposition

Opposition

4/9/2019: Opposition

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/9/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice

4/19/2019: Notice

Motion in Limine

6/7/2019: Motion in Limine

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/8/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY - VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT ;ETC

1/22/2018: COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY - VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT ;ETC

SUMMONS

1/22/2018: SUMMONS

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Trial Brief; Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' MIL No. 12); Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Opposition (to Defendant's MIL No. 13); Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Opposition (to Defendant's MIL No. 14); Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Opposition (Opposition to MIL No. 11); Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Reply (Brief in Support of Request for Offset); Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant); Courtesy Auto of Orange County, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY - VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Rocco J. Difrancesco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691282    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: 47

Rocco J. DiFrancesco v. FCA US LLC, et al.

 

MOTION TO TAX COSTS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Rocco J. DiFrancesco

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Non-Opposition filed by Defendant FCA US LLC

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

This was a Song-Beverly action in which Plaintiff alleged that the new 2013 Jeep Wrangler Unlimited that he purchased was defective.

Plaintiff moves to tax Defendant FCA US LLC’s memorandum of costs.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff moves to tax Defendant FCA US LLC’s costs in the amount of $4,453.63, reducing the $16,294.54 claimed by Defendant to $11,840.91. Defendant does not oppose this reduction in its costs.

Accordingly, Plaintiff Rocco J. DiFrancesco’s motion to tax FCA US LLC’s costs in the amount of $4,453.63 is GRANTED. Defendant to submit an Amended Judgment accordingly.

Moving party to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: December 20, 2019 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Any party may submit on the tentative ruling by contacting the courtroom via email at Smcdept47@lacourt.org by no later than 4:00 p.m. the day before the hearing.  All interested parties must be copied on the email.  It should be noted that if you submit on a tentative ruling the court will still conduct a hearing if any party appears. By submitting on the tentative you have, in essence, waived your right to be present at the hearing, and you should be aware that the court may not adopt the tentative, and may issue an order which modifies the tentative ruling in whole or in part.