This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 12:12:41 (UTC).

ROBYN NELSON VS CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 ROBYN NELSON filed an Other lawsuit against CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5078

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NELSON ROBYN

Defendants

436 BEVERLY HILLS LLC

CASSILETH PLASTIC SURGERY

CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS INC.

LISA B. CASSILETH M.D. INC.

MIN M.D. H. ELISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIRRUP ADAM B.

Defendant Attorney

SCHAFER TERRENCE JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/5/2022: Complaint

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/12/2023: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Substitution of Attorney

8/18/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

6/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Demand for Jury Trial

6/23/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/23/2022: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC AND CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS, INC. AND LISA B. CASSILETH, M.D., INC. DOING BUSINESS AS C

5/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS, 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC AND CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS, INC. AND LISA B. CASSILETH, M.D., INC. DOING BUSINESS AS C

Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION BEFORE TRIAL

5/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION BEFORE TRIAL

Answer

5/23/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2025
  • Hearing05/01/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2023
  • Hearing10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Adam B. Stirrup (Attorney): Organization Name changed from BARADAT & PABOOJIAN, INC. to Paboojian, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: ROBYN NELSON (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: Paboojian, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: H. ELISE MIN, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Ryan P. Deane (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Patrick to P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ROBYN NELSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: H. ELISE MIN, M.D. (Defendant); As to: ROBYN NELSON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY; Filed by: H. ELISE MIN, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ROBYN NELSON (Plaintiff); As to: CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS, INC. (Defendant); H. ELISE MIN, M.D. (Defendant); 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROBYN NELSON (Plaintiff); As to: CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS, INC. (Defendant); H. ELISE MIN, M.D. (Defendant); 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROBYN NELSON (Plaintiff); As to: CASSILETH RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGEONS, INC. (Defendant); H. ELISE MIN, M.D. (Defendant); 436 BEVERLY HILLS, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less