This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 10:04:51 (UTC).

ROBINSON, TAMMY VS ROBINSON, DUBRAVNY DONYA

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 ROBINSON, TAMMY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBINSON, DUBRAVNY DONYA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1090

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBINSON TAMMY

Respondents

ROBINSON DUBRAUNY DONYA

ROBINSON DUBRAVNY DONYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (Judgment Package submitted 09/26/19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (Judgment Package submitted 09/11/19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (Judgment Package submitted 08/20/19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.