Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:49:41 (UTC).

ROBINS KAPLAN LLP VS LOTUS MEDIA, LLC, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 ROBINS KAPLAN LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOTUS MEDIA, LLC, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY L. NEWMAN and GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7743

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NANCY L. NEWMAN

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINS KAPLAN LLP

Defendants

LOTUS MEDIA LLC

SEIBEL JAMES

JOHNSON WILLIAM

LOTUS ENTERTAINMENT

CASSELMAN DAVID B.

SEIBEL J.

JOHNSON W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SILBERFELD ROMAN

CASSELMAN DAVID BRUCE

ROBINS KAPLAN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LITTLE JAMES J.

RIBAKOFF LAW FIRM

STILMANN PHILIP H.

RIBAKOFF DAVID ZEV

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/23/2017: Complaint

Minute Order

8/4/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/21/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Case Management Statement

10/4/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

10/24/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/18/2017: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/5/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

3/5/2018: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

8/7/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/7/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Order - Dismissal

11/26/2018: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

11/26/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/26/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/5/2018: Minute Order

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Status Conference (re consolidation with related case SC127769) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (With prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action. * Each party bears its own fees & costs; Court reserves jurisidiction under CCP 664.6); Filed by ROBINS KAPLAN LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • at 11:55 AM in Department K; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department K; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Minute Order ((Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 11/26/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 1167.1 CCP; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Order Re: Related Cases - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by ROBINS KAPLAN LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases (W/SC127769 DEPT. P ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ROBINS KAPLAN LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. Casselman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILBERFELD ROMAN M. ESQ.