This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 00:25:57 (UTC).

ROBIN MESZOLY, TRUSTEE OF THE GRACE TRUST VS WILLIAM DENTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 ROBIN MESZOLY, TRUSTEE OF THE GRACE TRUST filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WILLIAM DENTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1077

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBIN MESZOLY TRUSTEE OF THE GRACE TRUST

Defendants

DENTON WILLIAM

WILLIAM DENTON AND MARGARET DENTON TRUSTEES OF THE WILLIAM MCCORD DENTON AND MARGI S. DENTON LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS JEREMIAH T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/24/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/1/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO ENTRY OF ORDER FOR RETAINED JURISDICTION AND PROPOSED ORDER

10/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO ENTRY OF ORDER FOR RETAINED JURISDICTION AND PROPOSED ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation To Entry Of Order For Retained Jurisdiction And Proposed Order); Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robin Meszoly, Trustee of The Grace Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS JEREMIAH