This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 04:08:24 (UTC).

ROBERTO MEDINA VS ACE INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 ROBERTO MEDINA filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against ACE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4242

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEDINA ROBERTO

Respondents

ACE INSURANCE COMPANY

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GREEN MICHAEL P

FARZAM JOSEPH S.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO COMPEL UNINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATION

12/30/2021: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO COMPEL UNINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/20/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE CASE;)

4/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE THE CASE;)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute the Case;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to Prosecute the Case;) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Prosecute the Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Association of Counsel); Filed by Roberto Medina (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roberto Medina (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketPetition (PETITION TO COMPEL UNINSURED MOTORIST ARBITRATION); Filed by Roberto Medina (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Roberto Medina (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roberto Medina (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARZAM, JOSEPH S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN MICHAEL PAUL