This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 03:41:51 (UTC).

ROBERTO FLORIDO VS JUAN J CASTRO ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 ROBERTO FLORIDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN J CASTRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4439

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FLORIDO ROBERTO

Defendants and Respondents

GARCIA JONATHAN HERNANDEZ

TRUCK RENTAL LT RYDER

CASTRO JUAN J.

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHAH SUNIL

Defendant Attorney

MARQUART JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

4/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/27/2020

4/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL) OF 04/27/2020

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

4/29/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE BANKRUPTCY TRIAL SETTING CONFE...)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE BANKRUPTCY TRIAL SETTING CONFE...)

Request for Dismissal

2/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES; HEARING ON ...)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES; HEARING ON ...)

Notice of Ruling

12/20/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER BY THE COURT GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONT. TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

8/13/2019: Order - ORDER BY THE COURT GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONT. TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Answer

8/30/2019: Answer

Answer

8/30/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Prosecute within 3yrs) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Roberto Florido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE BANKRUPTCY TRIAL SETTING CONFE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Juan J. Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketOrder (By the Court granting ex parte application to cont. trial and related dates)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roberto Florido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Roberto Florido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Roberto Florido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Roberto Florido (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694439    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ROBERTO FLORIDO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JUAN J. CASTRO, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC694439

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 17, 2019

Defendant, Juan J. Castro propounded form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs on Plaintiff on 9/03/19. To date, despite multiple attempts to meet and confer, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions.

Defendant’s motions are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c). Defendant seeks sanctions in the amount of $1155/motion. Defense Counsel bills at the rate of $225/hour. The Court awards one hour to prepare each form motion to compel. The Court awards three hours to appear at the hearing; the Court finds it is not reasonable to require Plaintiff to pay for Defendant’s choice to retain an attorney outside of Los Angeles County. The Court awards a total of six hours of attorney time at the rate of $225/hour, for a total of $1350 in attorneys’ fees. The Court also awards three filing fees of $60 each, or $180 in costs.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff only and not against his attorney of record; he is ordered to pay sanctions to Defendant, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $1530, within twenty days.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.