Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2019 at 04:56:31 (UTC).

ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO VS SABRINA JIMENEZ ESCARREGA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SABRINA JIMENEZ ESCARREGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3816

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VILLATORO ROBERTO CARLOS

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

WEST COVINA CITY OF

ESCARREGA SABRINA JIMENEZ

DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION - CALTRANS

JIMENEZ BARBARA

CALIFORNIA STATE OF

DOES 1 TO 50

ESCARREGA GEORGE B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY ESQ.

ESLAMBOLY-HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BAGGS ROBERT A. DEPUTY ATTORNEY

GIBBS PATRICK J. ESQ.

TOUCHSTONE JAMES R.

ANIELSKI JEFFREY M.

MCCONVILLE KEVIN JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/13/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/09/2019

8/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 08/09/2019

Notice of Settlement

8/9/2019: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue Trial

3/8/2019: Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue Trial

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

4/17/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

4/20/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

4/20/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE -

4/20/2018: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA

5/21/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/1/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/15/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Stipulation - No Order - of Dismissal

7/9/2018: Stipulation - No Order - of Dismissal

STIPULATION TO DISMISS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER

7/12/2018: STIPULATION TO DISMISS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((conditional)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 2:07 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of 08/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO (Plaintiff); CALIFORNIA, STATE OF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) STATUTORY LIABILITY/DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROBERTO CARLOS VILLATORO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COVINA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOUCHSTONE JAMES R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH