This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 02:35:14 (UTC).

ROBERTO CANSECO VS BLAYNE DENVER ROBERTSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 ROBERTO CANSECO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BLAYNE DENVER ROBERTSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0380

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CANSECO ROBERTO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ROBERTSON BLAYNE DENVER

DOMINGUEZ DARLENE L.

Other

KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE LAW OFFICES OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MARK R. WEINER & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/8/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Unknown

7/26/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S JURY FEE DEPOSIT

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Stipulation and Order

1/10/2019: Stipulation and Order

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2019: Request for Dismissal

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

12/27/2017: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS BLAYNE ROBERTSON AND DARLENE L. DOMINGUEZ; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

10/12/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS BLAYNE ROBERTSON AND DARLENE L. DOMINGUEZ; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

7/28/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

7/28/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Roberto Canseco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (continue trial); Filed by Knapp, Petersen & Clarke, Law Offices of (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S JURY FEE DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Roberto Canseco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Roberto Canseco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Blayne Denver Robertson (Defendant); Darlene L. Dominguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS BLAYNE ROBERTSON AND DARLENE L. DOMINGUEZ; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Roberto Canseco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY