This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2022 at 09:51:21 (UTC).

ROBERT WILLIAMSON VS GLS US FREIGHT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 ROBERT WILLIAMSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GLS US FREIGHT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0547

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMSON ROBERT

Defendants

ESCALANTE FRANCISCO

GLS US FREIGHT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIBA KASEY

Defendant Attorney

HUGHES BRADFORD G.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/19/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/18/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2024
  • Hearing09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GLS US Freight, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Francisco Escalante (Defendant); As to: Robert Williamson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robert Williamson (Plaintiff); As to: GLS US Freight, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/22/2022; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Williamson (Plaintiff); As to: GLS US Freight, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Francisco Escalante (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Williamson (Plaintiff); As to: GLS US Freight, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Francisco Escalante (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Williamson (Plaintiff); As to: GLS US Freight, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Francisco Escalante (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIBA KASEY