This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 11:17:31 (UTC).

ROBERT W. "BOB" BROWN, ET AL. VS RONALD A. ROSENBLUM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 ROBERT W BOB BROWN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RONALD A ROSENBLUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9208

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWN ROBERT W. "BOB"

BROWN PATRICIA "PATTI" G.

Defendants

ROSENBLUM RONALD A.

LAW OFFICES LES ZIEVE LLP

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATE-HOLDERS CWALT INC. ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2007-22 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-22

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

ROSENBLUM JACQUELINE D.

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

GLANTZ LARRY

ROSENBLUM FAMILY TRUST

NEW REZ LLC

SERVICE LINK TITLE COMPANY

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS

RECONTRUST COMPANY N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BARASCH ADAM N.

BRAUN NATHANIEL S.G.

PELLETIER NICK S.

SCOTT WILLIAM JASON

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/22/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S APPROVAL TO HEAR NOTICE OF DEMURRERS

12/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S APPROVAL TO HEAR NOTICE OF DEMURRERS

Request - REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY TO HEAR NOTICE OF DEMURRERS

1/5/2021: Request - REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY TO HEAR NOTICE OF DEMURRERS

Case Management Statement

1/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/15/2021

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Other - - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/21/2021: Other - - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/29/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/29/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/29/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice

1/29/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF W. JASON SCOTT RE MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS FOR DEMURRER

1/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF W. JASON SCOTT RE MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS FOR DEMURRER

Case Management Statement

3/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

4/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (filed by The Bank of New York Mellon) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (filed by Ronald A. Rosenblum) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (filed by Countrywide Home Loans) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike filed by Ronal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without prejudice, Complaint); Filed by Robert W. "Bob" Brown (Plaintiff); Patricia "Patti" G. Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Bank of New York Mellon (Defendant); New Rez, LLC (Defendant); Law Offices Les Zieve, LLP (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant); Countrywide Home Loans (Defendant); Recontrust Company, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint); Filed by Robert W. "Bob" Brown (Plaintiff); Patricia "Patti" G. Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant); Countrywide Home Loans (Defendant); Recontrust Company, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Defendant); Countrywide Home Loans (Defendant); Recontrust Company, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Of Non-Monetary Status To Complaint); Filed by Service Link Title Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketRequest (to go to Trial on Quiet Title Action); Filed by Robert W. "Bob" Brown (Plaintiff); Patricia "Patti" G. Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert W. "Bob" Brown (Plaintiff); Patricia "Patti" G. Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert W. "Bob" Brown (Plaintiff); Patricia "Patti" G. Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RECONTRUST COMPANY N.A is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW PENN FINANCIAL, LLC D/B/A/ SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING is a litigant

Latest cases where New Rez LLC is a litigant