This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 00:59:27 (UTC).

ROBERT TER-OGANESYAN, ET AL VS. VEHANOOSH GRIGORIAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 ROBERT TER-OGANESYAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against VEHANOOSH GRIGORIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN J. KRALIK and SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6885

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN J. KRALIK

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BANDARY MEGHEDY

TER-OGANESYAN ROBERT

BANDARY MEGHEDY AKA MELODY BANDARY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GRIGORIAN VEHANOOSH

GRIGORIAN ZAVEN

DOES 1-30

SKYTOP PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY DOE 1

MARKARIAN ARSINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEGEREDCHIAN ALEX

AGEMIAN ANAHID

Defendant Attorneys

TORABI KASRA

EISENBERG MARK STEVEN

Cross Defendant Attorney

SIEVERS ROBERT PAUL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Legacy Document

5/1/2018: Legacy Document

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/24/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Notice of Related Case

7/5/2018: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Statement

7/9/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/31/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons

8/7/2018: Summons

Notice of Motion

8/15/2018: Notice of Motion

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

9/6/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/6/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/20/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/26/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

2/1/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

2/1/2019: Separate Statement

Notice

5/20/2019: Notice

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Notice (of errata Exhibits to SAC); Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Motions to Compel); Filed by Vehanoosh Grigorian (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Opposition (to motions to compel Plaintiffs' further responses to discovery); Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Declaration (in support of plaintiffs' opposition to motion to compel further response); Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • Motion; Filed by Vehanoosh Grigorian (Defendant); Zaven Grigorian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T; (Application-Ex Parte; Not held-Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Meghedy Bandary (Plaintiff); Robert Ter-Oganesyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC106885    Hearing Date: September 15, 2020    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING

LC106885 TER-OGANESYAN V. GRIGORIAN

DENY.  MOVING PARTY HAS FAILED TO ADDRESS THE PLAIN READING OF THE STATUTE, AS RAISED BY THE OPPOSITION.  ON THIS POINT, THE REPLY IS SILENT.

CCP SECTION 437c(g) allows for a motion for summary judgment [CCP437c(a)] or a motion for summary adjudication of issues [CCP437c(f)]  "Upon the denial of a motion for summary judgment...the court shall specify one or more material facts ...and shall specifically refer to the evidence..." [Emphasis added. CCP437c(g)]  There is no corresponding requirement for motions for summary adjudication of issues, nor did moving party proffer authority supporting this position. Moving party has cited no case law in the moving or reply papers.  Moving party ignores the language..."of a motion for summary judgment."  Why moving party has ignored this distinction and has refused to even comment on it is perplexing. Regardless, the court issued an order in which the court identify triable issues of material fact and the evidence which supports those facts, and discussed these issues on the record. The motion is denied.