This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2023 at 02:29:36 (UTC).

ROBERT R. PAULO VS POLAR TANKERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 ROBERT R PAULO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against POLAR TANKERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0622

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULO ROBERT R.

Defendant

POLAR TANKERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAYLOR CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS JAMES I

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/19/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/20/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/21/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/25/2023: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Polar Tankers, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Robert R. Paulo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Polar Tankers, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Robert R. Paulo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robert R. Paulo (Plaintiff); As to: Polar Tankers, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 10/21/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert R. Paulo (Plaintiff); As to: Polar Tankers, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert R. Paulo (Plaintiff); As to: Polar Tankers, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert R. Paulo (Plaintiff); As to: Polar Tankers, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less