This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2023 at 12:58:24 (UTC).

ROBERT MICHAEL BRYAN VS WEYERHAEUSER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 ROBERT MICHAEL BRYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEYERHAEUSER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7444

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRYAN ROBERT MICHAEL

Defendants

MATRIX RISK MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS

WEYERHAEUSER

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/23/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/23/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/23/2022: Complaint

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

2/22/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/22/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL;)

4/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL;)

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/17/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/18/2023: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

5/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2024
  • Hearing08/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketAddress for William B Mayoff, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robert Michael Bryan (Plaintiff); As to: Robert Michael Bryan (Plaintiff); Service Date: 06/24/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: William B Mayoff, Esq. (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: William B Mayoff, Esq. (Attorney); As to: Robert Michael Bryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 05/18/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Robert Michael Bryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Michael Bryan (Plaintiff); As to: Weyerhaeuser (Defendant); Matrix Risk Management Solutions (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Michael Bryan (Plaintiff); As to: Weyerhaeuser (Defendant); Matrix Risk Management Solutions (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Michael Bryan (Plaintiff); As to: Weyerhaeuser (Defendant); Matrix Risk Management Solutions (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7444 Hearing Date: May 18, 2023 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff Robert Michael Bryan is GRANTED, effective upon filing proof of the signed order on the client.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



Case Number: *******7444 Hearing Date: April 14, 2023 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff Robert Michael Bryan is CONTINUED to May 18, 2023 at 1:30 pm as counsel has not filed proof of service of the moving papers on the client. The requisite forms must be served “on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (CRC 3.1362(d).)

Moving party is ordered to give notice.