This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2021 at 18:51:57 (UTC).

ROBERT KIM, ET AL. VS JAE RYUNG PAK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 ROBERT KIM filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JAE RYUNG PAK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON, TERRY GREEN and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6724

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

TERRY GREEN

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM SOOJIN

Defendants

RHEE PIL SEUNG

JEON HYON SOOK

CHO CHAE CHONG

NA SOO HYON

CHOI SANG KEUN

KIM CHRISTINE

HONG KYEONG WHAN

YI BYUNG DON

KWON TAE SEUNG

SHIN SAE YEON

CHOI KI YUN

AHN CHANG SOON

KIM YEON SU

BYUN TAE SIK

KIM MOON SUNG

AHN JAE HONG

PAK JAE RYUNG

CHO NAM JIK

CHUNG MYUNG SIK

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING (WITNESS TESTIMONY); ORDER TO SHOW...)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING (WITNESS TESTIMONY); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING (WITNESS TESTIMONY); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 06/17/2021

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING (WITNESS TESTIMONY); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 06/17/2021

Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (VERIFIED BY CLERK)

6/18/2021: Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (VERIFIED BY CLERK)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT (COPY SUBMITTED 3/16))

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT (COPY SUBMITTED 3/16))

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment ((verified by clerk)); Filed by Robert Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing ((witness testimony)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Default Prove Up Hearing (witness testimony); Order to Show...) of 06/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing (witness testimony); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment (Copy Submitted 3/16)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment (Copy Submitted 3/16))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Initial Status Conference (and Order to Show Cause re proof of service.) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Robert Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Robert Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of 12/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (against Judge: Susan Bryant-Deason); Filed by Robert Kim (Plaintiff); Soojin Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Kim (Plaintiff); Soojin Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Kim (Plaintiff); Soojin Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NA SOO HYON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAMIE