This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 10:26:29 (UTC).

ROBERT HYUN VS LAILA FAJARDO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 ROBERT HYUN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAILA FAJARDO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3845

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYUN ROBERT

Defendants

FAJARDO LAILA

FAJARDO RODOLFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM EDWARD S

Defendant Attorneys

KWAK JOHN

SARKISSIAN PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

7/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

2/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Notice - NOTICE OF DAVID C. KADIN BECOMING OF COUNSEL TO ESK LAW GROUP WITH RESPECT TO THE INSTANT CASE

2/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF DAVID C. KADIN BECOMING OF COUNSEL TO ESK LAW GROUP WITH RESPECT TO THE INSTANT CASE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/19/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2024
  • Hearing06/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2023
  • Hearing10/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Laila Fajardo (Defendant); As to: Robert Hyun (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/03/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/17/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Laila Fajardo (Defendant); Rodolfo Fajardo (Defendant); As to: Robert Hyun (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Laila Fajardo (Defendant); Rodolfo Fajardo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Laila Fajardo (Defendant); Rodolfo Fajardo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Hyun (Plaintiff); As to: Laila Fajardo (Defendant); Rodolfo Fajardo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Hyun (Plaintiff); As to: Laila Fajardo (Defendant); Rodolfo Fajardo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Hyun (Plaintiff); As to: Laila Fajardo (Defendant); Rodolfo Fajardo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less