This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 06:30:12 (UTC).

ROBERT GODAS VS PUMP RESTAURANT

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 ROBERT GODAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PUMP RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3347

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GODAS ROBERT

Defendants

PUMP RESTAURANT

VANDERPUMP LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT DANIEL M.

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN MICHAEL GUY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/2/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/20/2023: Request for Dismissal

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/6/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

9/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/3/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/28/2022: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/7/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Robert Godas on 06/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Robert Godas as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Robert Godas (Plaintiff); As to: Pump Restaurant (Defendant); Lisa Vanderpump (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Pump Restaurant (Defendant); As to: Robert Godas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/28/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 09/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Robert Godas on 06/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Robert Godas as to Lisa Vanderpump

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Godas (Plaintiff); As to: Pump Restaurant (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Godas (Plaintiff); As to: Pump Restaurant (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Godas (Plaintiff); As to: Pump Restaurant (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less