This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 07:01:36 (UTC).

ROBERT FORBES ET AL VS THE REO GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 ROBERT FORBES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE REO GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8737

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

FORBES PATRICIA

FORBES ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

VARTAN SHOBERT

ADENHEIM INC

THE REO GROUP INC

DOES 1 TO 100

UNICITIZENS FINANCIAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MANN JEFF A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HALAVAIS & ASSOCIATES APP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/11/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

2/8/2018: JUDGMENT

ORDER ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/8/2018: ORDER ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

2/20/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

2/20/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

2/20/2018: MEMO COSTS SUMMARY

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/21/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/21/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/16/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

3/22/2018: Minute Order

RULING RE: DISMISSAL

3/22/2018: RULING RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF PREVAILING PARTY ON CONTRACT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; MORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/29/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF PREVAILING PARTY ON CONTRACT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; MORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL, ETC

4/2/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL, ETC

DECLARATION OF JEFF A. MANN; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DETERMINE PREVAILING PARTY AND AWARD ATTORNEY'S FEES

5/3/2018: DECLARATION OF JEFF A. MANN; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DETERMINE PREVAILING PARTY AND AWARD ATTORNEY'S FEES

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF PREVAILING PARTY ON CONTRACT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/16/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DESIGNATION OF PREVAILING PARTY ON CONTRACT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

RULING RE;

5/22/2018: RULING RE;

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Robert Forbes (Plaintiff); Patricia Forbes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Supplemental Declaration; Filed by Robert Forbes (Plaintiff); Patricia Forbes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • ) )SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JEFF )A. MANN AND CHRISTINE KIM IN SUPPORT )OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (Motion to Set Aside Dismissal; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • RULING RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by The Reo Group, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: PRE-DEMURRER MEET AND CONFER AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Robert Forbes (Plaintiff); Patricia Forbes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF FIDCUCIARY DUTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Robert Forbes (Plaintiff); Patricia Forbes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADENHEIM INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where REO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN JEFF A.