This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 09:56:58 (UTC).

ROBERT ESTRADA VS TRC COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 ROBERT ESTRADA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TRC COMPANIES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7078

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA ROBERT

Defendants

TRC COMPANIES INC.

TRC COMPANIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOON KANE

Defendant Attorneys

SHAW SAIGE

SEBRA D CREIGHTON

CABADA JOSE G.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF FIRST AM...)

10/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING AND SERVING OF FIRST AM...)

Answer - DEFENDANTS TRC COMPANIES, INC. AND TRC COMPANIES, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

10/19/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS TRC COMPANIES, INC. AND TRC COMPANIES, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

8/25/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CLASS CERTIFICATION FILING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION PURPOSES PROPOSED ORDER

8/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CLASS CERTIFICATION FILING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION PURPOSES PROPOSED ORDER

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/1/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADING;)

4/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADING;)

Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

2/23/2022: Initial Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/1/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE - CASE ANYWHERE

3/1/2022: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE - CASE ANYWHERE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

3/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Case Management Order

3/1/2022: Case Management Order

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/7/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS) OF 01/06/2022

1/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS) OF 01/06/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS)

1/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS)

Answer - DEFENDANTS TRC COMPANIES, INC. AND TRC COMPANIES, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

1/5/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS TRC COMPANIES, INC. AND TRC COMPANIES, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Initial Status Conference Report - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

11/23/2021: Initial Status Conference Report - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of First Amended Complaint and Answer to First Amended Complaint scheduled for 10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 updated: Result Date to 10/26/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of First Am...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDefendants TRC Companies, Inc. And TRC Companies, LLCs Answer To Plaintiffs First Amended Class And Representative Action Complaint; Filed by: TRC Companies, Inc. (Defendant); TRC Companies, LLC (Defendant); As to: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint; Filed by: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: TRC Companies, Inc. (Defendant); TRC Companies, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Mediation scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of First Amended Complaint and Answer to First Amended Complaint scheduled for 10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order To Vacate Class Certification Filing Deadline For Mediation Purposes Order: Status Date changed from 08/18/2022 to 08/18/2022; Filed By: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Name Extension changed from To Vacate Class Certification Filing Deadline For Mediation Purposes Proposed Order to To Vacate Class Certification Filing Deadline For Mediation Purposes Order; Result Date: 08/18/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order To Vacate Class Certification Filing Deadline For Mediation Purposes Proposed Order; Signed and Filed by: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: TRC Companies, Inc. (Defendant); TRC Companies, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: TRC Companies, Inc. (Defendant); TRC Companies, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location; Filed by: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: TRC Companies, Inc. (Defendant); TRC Companies, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Estrada (Plaintiff); As to: TRC Companies, Inc. (Defendant); TRC Companies, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 9 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less