This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 00:25:53 (UTC).

ROBERT DYE VS PREMIERE REHABILITATION AND WELLNESS CENTER OF LANCASTER, LP, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 ROBERT DYE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PREMIERE REHABILITATION AND WELLNESS CENTER OF LANCASTER, LP, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0239

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYE ROBERT

Defendants

BRIUS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PREMIERE REHABILITATION AND WELLNESS CENTER OF LANCASTER LP A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA THE ELLISON JOHN TRANSITIONAL CARE CENTER

VERNON HEALTHCARE CENTER A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LOS FELIZ HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

HIGHLAND PARK SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RECHNITZ SHLOMO

BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO. A CORPORATION

MAR VISTA COUNTRY VILLA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HEALTHCARE CENTER OF DOWNEY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLOCH WILLIAM WILKES

SALOMONS GARY

Defendant Attorneys

BARRETT WILLIAM GEORGE

HESTER CECILLE LOUISE

KJAR JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, WILLIAM W. BLOCH, CONCERNING STATUS MATTER

6/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, WILLIAM W. BLOCH, CONCERNING STATUS MATTER

Request for Dismissal

12/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/23/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY TH...)

8/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY TH...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

8/27/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

8/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)

7/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HEA...)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLCS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

7/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLCS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/18/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/18/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CECILLE L. HESTER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 (A)(2), ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS

5/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CECILLE L. HESTER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41 (A)(2), ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION]

5/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Hearing12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration Completion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Failure to Appear and Failure to Prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Failure to Appe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Plaintiff's Counsel, William W. Bloch, Concerning Status of Matter); Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Plaintiff's Counsel, William W. Bloch, Concerning Status Matter); Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert Dye (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HIGHLAND PARK SKILLED NURSING & WELLNESS CENTRE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LAWNDALE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DRIFTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant