This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 19:52:44 (UTC).

ROBERT CORTES VS DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS,

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 ROBERT CORTES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4187

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTES ROBERT

Defendants

DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS

ALLEN RON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NATANZI O. DAVID ESQ.

ROTHMAN JAY STUART

Defendant Attorneys

KANANI NAVID

PERRY MICHAEL R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • Hearing08/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Further Status Conference (Re Defendant Ron Allen) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Further Status Conference Re De...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DDS Legal Support Systems (Defendant); Ron Allen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Ron Allen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder (on Stipulation to Set Aside Default); Filed by Ron Allen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Service); Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 4:16 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re C.C.P. 170.6) of 09/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re C.C.P. 170.6)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint (For Damages); Filed by Robert Cortes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant