This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 17:57:14 (UTC).

ROBERT CONRAD LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 ROBERT CONRAD LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAY, GUS T. and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6412

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAY, GUS T.

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORTS TAMARA

Respondents

MESNICK MICHAEL

CONRAD SHANE ROBERT

CONRAD CHRISTIAN

Not Classified By Court

VENTURA CO. SUPERIOR COURT

ROBERT CONRAD LIVING TRUST

SUPERIOR COURT

Interested Party

CONRAD NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HOFFMAN NATHAN BERRY

Respondent Attorneys

BIRKEL JULIA LYNN

ERICKSON NEIL CRAIG

ZETJIAN VATCHE J

 

Court Documents

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/29/2022: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice - Hearing - Notice of MSC

3/29/2022: Notice - Hearing - Notice of MSC

Minute Order

3/23/2022: Minute Order

Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Statements)

2/25/2022: Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Statements)

Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Motions)

2/25/2022: Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Motions)

Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Statements)

2/28/2022: Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Statements)

Motion - Quash - JOINT MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF NOTICES OF MOTION AND MOTIONS TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

2/28/2022: Motion - Quash - JOINT MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF NOTICES OF MOTION AND MOTIONS TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (3 OF 4)

2/28/2022: Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (3 OF 4)

Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Statements)

3/1/2022: Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (Statements)

Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (1 OF 4)

3/1/2022: Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (1 OF 4)

Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (2 of 4)

3/3/2022: Motion - Quash - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS (2 of 4)

Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

3/3/2022: Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS

Objection - Trust Petition - Respondent Christian Robert Conrad's Objections and Opposition to Petition to Determine Validity or Invalidity of the Amendments to Robert Conrad Living Trust

3/4/2022: Objection - Trust Petition - Respondent Christian Robert Conrad's Objections and Opposition to Petition to Determine Validity or Invalidity of the Amendments to Robert Conrad Living Trust

Proof of Service

3/9/2022: Proof of Service

Motion - Motion for Accounting

1/18/2022: Motion - Motion for Accounting

Minute Order

1/19/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/19/2022: Minute Order

Order - Granting Motion to Compel Petition to Comply with Special Interrogatories, Set One: Request for Santctions

12/20/2021: Order - Granting Motion to Compel Petition to Comply with Special Interrogatories, Set One: Request for Santctions

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • Hearing12/12/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 1:30 PM in Probate Department MSC 250B at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of MSC ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order, Originally Filed 7/27/2020 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketPetition/Motion - Filed/Paid in Other County (No Fee) (to Determine Validity or Invalidity of the Trust Amendments ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Assignment ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketStipulation (to Grant Motion to Transfer Venue and Order Thereon, Originally Filed 7/15/2020 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Register of Actions ); Filed by Court-Other CountyState

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketIncoming Transfer (Other County) - Letters not Issued (Ventura Co. Superior Court, 56-2020-00541977-PR-TR-OXN )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer - Probate (Neil Erickson )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer - Probate (Nathan Hoffman )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgement of Receipt of Documents Re: Case Transfer (Originally Filed 8/04/2020 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Transfer Out, Originally Filed 8/04/2020 ); Filed by Court-Other CountyState

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERICKSON NEIL CRAIG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIRKEL JULIA LYNN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZETJIAN VATCHE J