Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 17:44:50 (UTC).

ROBERT CISNEROS VS STAPLES CONTRACT & COMMERCIAL LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 ROBERT CISNEROS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against STAPLES CONTRACT COMMERCIAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2066

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CISNEROS ROBERT

Defendant

STAPLES CONTRACT & COMMERCIAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY MARCUS JOSEPH

GROMBACHER KILEY LYNN

KING LIRIT ARIELLA

MAJARIAN SAHAG II

Defendant Attorneys

LADEW MATTHEW EARL

MURATA TRITIA MIYUKI

KUBIN KAREN JOYCE

ZINS DAVID PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

4/16/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

3/1/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE P. DOMINGUEZ, CSR #12523

3/8/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JORGE P. DOMINGUEZ, CSR #12523

Case Management Order

3/8/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Appearance

12/14/2020: Notice of Appearance

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 12/02/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 12/02/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

12/2/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

12/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/30/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 16:00 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Robert Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Filed by Staples Contract & Commercial LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Jorge P. Dominguez, CSR #12523); Filed by Staples Contract & Commercial LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by Staples Contract & Commercial LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance (and Tendering of Complex Fee); Filed by Staples Contract & Commercial LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:50 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Newly Filed Class Action) of 12/02/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Cisneros (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAPLES CONTRACT AND COMMERCIAL. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUBIN, KAREN J.