This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 03:11:51 (UTC).

ROBERT CHRISTOPHER HENNING VS E S KLUFT & COMPANY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by ROBERT CHRISTOPHER HENNING against E S KLUFT COMPANY INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5611

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HENNING ROBERT CHRISTOPHER

Respondents and Defendants

FLEX EQUIPOS DE DESCANSO S.A.

E.S. KLUFT & COMPANY INC.

DOES 1 TO 25

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/16/2019: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES S. COOPER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFTS. MSJ/MSA

10/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES S. COOPER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFTS. MSJ/MSA

Separate Statement

10/30/2019: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Notice of Settlement

12/12/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/13/2019

12/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/13/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/11/2019

4/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 04/11/2019

CASE I4ANAGEMENT ORDER

9/6/2018: CASE I4ANAGEMENT ORDER

PLAINTIFF ROBERT CHRISTOPHER HENNING'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/6/2018: PLAINTIFF ROBERT CHRISTOPHER HENNING'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/22/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

7/18/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

6/27/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/23/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/16/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL, ETC

5/9/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL, ETC

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Robert Christopher Henning (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Court's Vacating Trial and FSC Dates and Setting OSC re Dismissal); Filed by Robert Christopher Henning (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Robert Christopher Henning (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Cancellation of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Robert Christopher Henning (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Robert Christopher Henning (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Robert Christopher Henning (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Christopher Henning (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705611    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 74

BC705611 ROBERT CHRISTOPHER HENNING VS E S KLUFT & COMPANY INC

Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion for summary judgment is denied as there are triable issues of fact including whether plaintiff suffered damages in accepting a job with a salary of $125,000 after the promised job with a salary of $330,000 was revoked, whether Sawan would have terminated plaintiff if plaintiff had not given notice that he was leaving employment with Wesley Allen, what plaintiff said regarding the immigration employee policies, and whether plaintiff’s actions were sufficient to support revocation of the employment before it began. The motion for summary adjudication is denied on procedural grounds.

Timeliness of Opposition

Defendants waived any issue as to the timeliness of the opposition by addressing it on the merits. (Carlton v. Quint (2000) 77 Cal. App. 4th 690, 697.)

Evidentiary Objections

Plaintiff’s objections are overruled for failure to comply with CA Rule of Court, rule 3.1354. Defendants’ objections are overruled.

Motion for Summary Judgment

There are triable issues of fact. These include whether plaintiff suffered damages in accepting a job with a salary of $125,000 after the promised job with a salary of $330,000 was revoked, whether Sawan would have terminated plaintiff if plaintiff had not given notice that he was leaving employment with Wesley Allen, what plaintiff said regarding the immigration employee policies, and whether plaintiff’s actions were sufficient to support revocation of the employment before it began.

Motions for Summary Adjudication

CA Rule of Court, rule 3.1350(b) states that the issues for adjudication must be stated in the notice of motion and issues must be repeated verbatim in separate statement. Defendants’ argument that this does not apply when adjudication is requested as an alternative to summary judgment is not persuasive. Following that argument, an opposing party would have to try to determine which facts were submitted in support of the request for adjudication, and the court would have to decide the issue without a clear statement of the facts submitted in support of the issue.