Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 08:43:55 (UTC).

ROBERT CARSON, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS DANNY E. MARKOE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DANNY. E. MARKOE TRUST DATED MARCH 13

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 ROBERT CARSON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DANNY E MARKOE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DANNY E MARKOE TRUST DATED MARCH 13. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6411

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CARSON AN INDIVIDUAL HONG

CARSON AN INDIVIDUAL ROBERT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MARKOE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DANNY. E. MARKOE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARNEGIE ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

MIYAMOTO RONALD K

MAKI KEVIN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL REGARDING NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

2/11/2021: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL REGARDING NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

RETURNED MAIL

2/17/2021: RETURNED MAIL

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/24/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

2/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

3/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

3/2/2021: Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

12/1/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/27/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Robert Carson, an individual (Plaintiff); Hong Carson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Robert Carson, an individual (Plaintiff); Hong Carson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder (Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Danny E. Markoe, individually and as Trustee of the Danny. E. Markoe Trust dated March 13 (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Danny E. Markoe, individually and as Trustee of the Danny. E. Markoe Trust dated March 13 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Danny E. Markoe, individually and as Trustee of the Danny. E. Markoe Trust dated March 13 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Danny E. Markoe, individually and as Trustee of the Danny. E. Markoe Trust dated March 13 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Robert Carson, an individual (Plaintiff); Hong Carson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Robert Carson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Carson, an individual (Plaintiff); Hong Carson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert Carson, an individual (Plaintiff); Hong Carson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Carson, an individual (Plaintiff); Hong Carson, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAKI KEVIN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIYAMOTO RONALD K