This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2022 at 09:55:57 (UTC).

ROBERT CARR VS PAM TRANSPORT, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 ROBERT CARR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PAM TRANSPORT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0615

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARR ROBERT

Defendants

PAM TRANSPORT LLC

P.A.M TRANSPORT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWAN ANGELA

Defendant Attorneys

GLASS ZAKIYA N.

GLASS ZAKIYA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASES) OF 02/01/2022

2/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASES) OF 02/01/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASES)

2/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASES)

Notice of Related Case

1/7/2022: Notice of Related Case

Answer

12/23/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/13/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

12/7/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/22/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

11/29/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/5/2021: PI General Order

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

3/26/2021: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/18/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Docketat 12:05 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Relating and Consolidating Cases) of 02/01/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Relating and Consolidating Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by P.A.M TRANSPORT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by P.A.M TRANSPORT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by P.A.M TRANSPORT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Robert Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by P.A.M TRANSPORT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Pam Transport, LLC (Defendant); P.A.M TRANSPORT, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Robert Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pam Transport, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Robert Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Carr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P.A.M. Transport, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASS ZAKIYA N.