Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2020 at 03:11:14 (UTC).

ROBERT BOHI VS TJC REAL ESTATE TRANSACTIONS GROUP LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 ROBERT BOHI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TJC REAL ESTATE TRANSACTIONS GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6365

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOHI ROBERT

Defendants

BROWN CHANTILLY AN INDIVIDUAL

TJC REAL ESTATE TRANSACTIONS GROUP LLC

HERNANDEZ MARIANN AN INDIVIDUAL

BROWN CHANTILLY

HERNANDEZ MARIANN

DIGITAL INSURANCE AGENCY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KING TESSA

REISNER ADAM

TAYLOR GREGORY RAY

TAYLOR GREGORY ESQ.

REISNER ADAM ESQ.

KING TESSA ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS FELICIA ANNE

COOPER JARRYD M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Ruling

10/9/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

9/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Answer

7/24/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/28/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/13/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by TJC Real Estate Transactions Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TJC Real Estate Transactions Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TJC Real Estate Transactions Group, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert Bohi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS FELICIA ANNE