This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 10:00:06 (UTC).

ROBERT BISHOP VS MORTON VLONN TARELL

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 ROBERT BISHOP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MORTON VLONN TARELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9731

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BISHOP ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 2

TARELL MORTON VLONN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/16/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

10/16/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICES-CIVIL

7/31/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICES-CIVIL

PRESERVETION OF RIGHT TO SEEK PUNITIVE DAMAGES ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/31/2018: PRESERVETION OF RIGHT TO SEEK PUNITIVE DAMAGES ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF ROBERT BISHOF IN SUPPORT OF HIS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/31/2018: DECLARATION OF ROBERT BISHOF IN SUPPORT OF HIS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION AND STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

7/31/2018: DECLARATION AND STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/20/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF ROBERT BISHOP IN SUPPORT OF HIS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/20/2018: DECLARATION OF ROBERT BISHOP IN SUPPORT OF HIS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

4/2/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/2/2019: Unknown

Unknown

1/8/2019: Unknown

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/18/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

REQUEST FOR ENRY OF DEFAULT

7/31/2018: REQUEST FOR ENRY OF DEFAULT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 04/02/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by ROBERT BISHOP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by ROBERT BISHOP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by ROBERT BISHOP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by ROBERT BISHOP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ROBERT BISHOP IN SUPPORT OF HIS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROBERT BISHOP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9731    Hearing Date: March 05, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

On October 16, 2017, Plaintiff Robert Bishop filed this action alleging injury arising from a motor vehicle accident against Defendant Morton Vlonn Tarell. On June 26, 2019, Plaintiff obtained entry of default against Defendant. On November 18, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion for entry of default judgment.

To obtain a default judgment, Plaintiff must complete and file a Request for Entry of Default on form CIV-100, a proposed Judgment on form JUD-100, and a Declaration in Support of Application of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP ; 585(d). Plaintiff must submit evidence showing that he incurred $10,000 in damages due to the injury (for example, medical bills) and suffered $15,000 in pain and suffering.

The motion is DENIED because Plaintiff has not filed these completed forms and evidence. The Court continues the Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Failure to File a Default Judgment to August 21, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 27.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.