Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 13:47:41 (UTC).

ROBERT BAGHDASARYAN VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 ROBERT BAGHDASARYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0870

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAGHDASARYAN ROBERT

Defendants

CAR CITY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANOOKIAN CLAUDE

Defendant Attorney

DAO VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

2/23/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/11/2021

3/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/11/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 12/30/2020

12/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 12/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

12/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

11/24/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/16/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/16/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice entire action of all parties and all causes of action); Filed by Robert Baghdasaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Robert Baghdasaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 12/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Robert Baghdasaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Robert Baghdasaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Robert Baghdasaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Robert Baghdasaryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOSALAN LLC DBA CAR CITY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANOOKIAN CLAUDE