This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 17:10:09 (UTC).

ROBERT A VUKELICH VS LINDSEY CALHOUN

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 ROBERT A VUKELICH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LINDSEY CALHOUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THERESA M. TRABER, BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA and VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1014

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THERESA M. TRABER

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

VUKELICH ROBERT A DBA RAVE CONSTRUCTION

RRR LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RAVE CONSTRUCTION

Defendant

CALHOUN LINDSEY

Cross Plaintiff

COLHOUN LINDSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

TENNER JAMES

ZUCKER II LAWRENCE S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STANTON MITCHEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

8/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

5/10/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail

2/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

2/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Brief - BRIEF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

1/29/2021: Brief - BRIEF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S MSC BRIEF

2/3/2021: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S MSC BRIEF

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

1/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/11/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/21/2021

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/21/2021

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/1/2020: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/17/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/18/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/22/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Trial Readiness Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by ROBERT A VUKELICH (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department C, Valerie Salkin, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by ROBERT A VUKELICH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketBrief (Defendant's MSC Brief); Filed by LINDSEY COLHOUN (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketBrief (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF); Filed by ROBERT A VUKELICH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by LINDSEY COLHOUN (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lindsey Colhoun Erroneously Sued As LINDSEY CALHOUN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by LINDSEY COLHOUN (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by LINDSEY COLHOUN (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROBERT A VUKELICH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROBERT A VUKELICH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROBERT A VUKELICH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less