This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2018 at 10:10:38 (UTC).

ROBBIN DUNN VS IN-SHAPE HEALTH CLUBS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 ROBBIN DUNN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IN-SHAPE HEALTH CLUBS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7061

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNN ROBBIN

Defendant

IN-SHAPE HEALTH CLUBS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEPORE ROBERT T. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

OLSON SONALI

 

Court Documents

SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER

10/24/2016: SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

4/6/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/6/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

4/6/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

4/7/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Proof of Service

5/2/2017: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/30/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/11/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by IN-SHAPE HEALTH CLUBS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Answer; Filed by IN-SHAPE HEALTH CLUBS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROBBIN DUNN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by ROBBIN DUNN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less