This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2023 at 10:22:13 (UTC).

ROBBIE CALVIN VS MARTIN FEDERICO RUIZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 ROBBIE CALVIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTIN FEDERICO RUIZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0074

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALVIN ROBBIE

Defendants

BRASWELL SHANTELL

NASH BOBBY

RUIZ MARTIN FEDERICO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLE TERRY J

DORDICK GARY A

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/20/2023: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2026
  • Hearing01/20/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2024
  • Hearing03/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2024
  • Hearing03/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robbie Calvin (Plaintiff); As to: Martin Federico Ruiz (Defendant); Bobby Nash (Defendant); Shantell Braswell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/22/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/09/2026 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/20/2026 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robbie Calvin (Plaintiff); As to: Martin Federico Ruiz (Defendant); Bobby Nash (Defendant); Shantell Braswell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robbie Calvin (Plaintiff); As to: Martin Federico Ruiz (Defendant); Bobby Nash (Defendant); Shantell Braswell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/09/2026 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen Morgan in Department A14 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 03/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/13/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less