This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2020 at 01:22:08 (UTC).

ROB SCHILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ONIK FILIPIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 ROB SCHILLER, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ONIK FILIPIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0708

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHILLER AN INDIVIDUAL ROB

Defendants

FLIP LISTING PLLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FILIPIAN AN INDIVIDUAL ONIK AKA JOHN FILIPIAN AN INDIVIDUAL

HATSAKORZIAN AN INDIVIDUAL MARIE

AIR KING A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

FIRST MILL LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DELEX REALTY LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1 THROUGH 30 INCLUSIVE DOES

BRINKLEY AN INDIVIDUAL ROB

AMERICAN TITLE SERVICES LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MY HOME GROUP LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MIRZAKHANYAN AN INDIVIDUAL EDGAR

OMG REAL ESTATE LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHORR ZACHARY D

Defendant Attorney

KALVESTRAN JENNIFER CORRINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

3/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/24/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND/OR DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION

2/18/2020: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND/OR DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION

Request for Judicial Notice

2/18/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Personal Service

2/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/16/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/7/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons (and/or Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction); Filed by AMERICAN TITLE SERVICES, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by AMERICAN TITLE SERVICES, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ROB SCHILLER, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHORR ZACHARY D.