This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 23:59:48 (UTC).

RJS FINANCIAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS DOS POTRILLOS LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 RJS FINANCIAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DOS POTRILLOS LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3490

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RJS FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PLM LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DAVID A ROMERO TRUSTEE OF THE LAGUNA SECA LIVING TRUST

ROMERO DAVID A.

DOS POTRILLOS LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD ELMIRA R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ALDEN NICK A

Other Attorneys

MARKS RICHARD D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS; DECLARATION OF ELMIRA R. HOWARD

9/17/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS; DECLARATION OF ELMIRA R. HOWARD

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF RJS FINANCIAL, INC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS

9/17/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF RJS FINANCIAL, INC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/9/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Substitution of Attorney

8/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID ROMERO

8/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID ROMERO

Exhibit List

8/23/2021: Exhibit List

Exhibit List - APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS

8/23/2021: Exhibit List - APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS

Request for Judicial Notice

8/23/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Cross-Complaint

7/27/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/19/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/27/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

12/17/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

11/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketReply (RJS Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Answer and Cross-Complaint); Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketReply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE THE DEFAULT.); Filed by DOS POTRILLOS LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DAVID A. ROMERO (Defendant); DAVID A ROMERO, TRUSTEE OF THE LAGUNA SECA LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendants Motion to Set Aside Defaults; Declaration of Elmira R. Howard); Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF RJS FINANCIAL, INC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS); Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF DAVID A. ROMERO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE THE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANTS AND EX PARTE APPLICATION); Filed by DOS POTRILLOS LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DAVID A. ROMERO (Defendant); DAVID A ROMERO, TRUSTEE OF THE LAGUNA SECA LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.); Filed by DOS POTRILLOS LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DAVID A. ROMERO (Defendant); DAVID A ROMERO, TRUSTEE OF THE LAGUNA SECA LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by DOS POTRILLOS LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DAVID A. ROMERO (Defendant); DAVID A ROMERO, TRUSTEE OF THE LAGUNA SECA LIVING TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Recording of Notice of Lis Pendens); Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RJS FINANCIAL, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RJS FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLM LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS RICHARD D. ESQ.