This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 09:57:54 (UTC).

R&J SHEET METAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 R J SHEET METAL, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against S J AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5542

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R&J SHEET METAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHAJANIAN ALEX P.

Defendant Attorney

LUM MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

4/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/25/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

4/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

4/18/2022: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by S.J. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant); Federal Insurance Company (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by S.J. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant); Federal Insurance Company (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by S.J. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc. (Defendant); Federal Insurance Company (Defendant); Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by R&J Sheet Metal, Inc. a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R&J SHEET METAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant