This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 12:19:44 (UTC).

RIVERSIDE NBS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 RIVERSIDE NBS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8661

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

7041 OWENSMOUTH PARK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

BABAEIAN AN INDIVIDUAL HAMID

BABAEIAN AN INDIVIDUAL MARINA

RIDE A COWBOY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

RIVERSIDE NBS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MONTEREY INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/4/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Riverside NBS, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); 7041 Owensmouth Park, LLC, a California Limited Liability Corporation (Plaintiff); Hamid Babaeian, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Riverside NBS, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); 7041 Owensmouth Park, LLC, a California Limited Liability Corporation (Plaintiff); Hamid Babaeian, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Riverside NBS, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); 7041 Owensmouth Park, LLC, a California Limited Liability Corporation (Plaintiff); Hamid Babaeian, an individual (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG