Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:16:29 (UTC).

RIVERA, ALFREDO VS RIVERA, MARIVIC MACASIEB

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 RIVERA, ALFREDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RIVERA, MARIVIC MACASIEB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEIS, COLIN P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8582

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEIS, COLIN P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIVERA ALFREDO

Respondent

RIVERA MARIVIC MACASIEB

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 23, Leis, Colin P., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Notice - Limited Scope Representation; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Judgment Package Received After Hearing (Sent to dept. 23 on 09/21/2018 - orders made 07/10/18 - Rejcted 10.03.18 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 23, Leis, Colin P., Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Off Calendar - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Ex Parte - Application; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less